NJ A1400 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1452
Note: Carry Over of previous A4318
Note: Carry Over of previous S3860
Note: Carry Over of previous A4318
Note: Carry Over of previous S3860
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain armed security officers regulated by "Detective Melvin Vincent Santiago's Law" in crimes of assault and disarming an officer.
Title
Includes certain armed security officers regulated by "Detective Melvin Vincent Santiago's Law" in crimes of assault and disarming an officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1400 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4318 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S802 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3860 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4318 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S802 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3860 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee