NJ A1366 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5461

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns motor vehicle subscription services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns motor vehicle subscription services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-08-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5461 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2256 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback