NJ A1348 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1577
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motorists operating vehicles to maintain reasonable and safe distance when overtaking pedestrians and certain bicycles.
Title
Requires motorists operating vehicles to maintain reasonable and safe distance when overtaking pedestrians and certain bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1577 (Carry Over) 2014-06-16 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2219 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2219 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee