NJ A1344 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2486
Note: Carry Over of previous S1868
Note: Carry Over of previous S1868
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Pending: Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary deduction for food and beverage establishments from certain sales and use tax remittances.
Title
Provides temporary deduction for food and beverage establishments from certain sales and use tax remittances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2486 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S1868 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2564 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1868 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2564 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1344 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A1500/1344_I1.HTM |