NJ A1328 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1344
Note: Carry Foward to future S1958
Note: Carry Over of previous A427
Note: Carry Over of previous S2124
Note: Carry Foward to future S1958
Note: Carry Over of previous A427
Note: Carry Over of previous S2124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes mandatory training program for human resources officers of public employers on handling and responding to reports of domestic violence.
Title
Establishes mandatory training program for human resources officers of public employers on handling and responding to reports of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A1328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A427 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1183 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2124 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1328 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A427 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1183 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2124 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1328 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1328_I1.HTM |