NJ A1269 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S518
Note: Carry Foward to future A2233
Note: Carry Over of previous A1284
Note: Carry Foward to future A2233
Note: Carry Over of previous A1284
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates one percent tax on purchasers of Class 4A commercial property transferred for consideration in excess of $1 million.
Title
Eliminates one percent tax on purchasers of Class 4A commercial property transferred for consideration in excess of $1 million.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3490 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3490 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S3490 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1269 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1269 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1284 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3490 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1269 (1R)
A1269 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1284 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3490 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1269 (1R)