NJ A1257 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1061
Note: Carry Foward to future S721
Note: Carry Over of previous A5377
Note: Carry Over of previous S3856
Note: Carry Foward to future S721
Note: Carry Over of previous A5377
Note: Carry Over of previous S3856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public venues and places of worship to submit emergency plans to law enforcement agencies for purpose of preparing for mass casualty and active shooter events.
Title
Requires certain public venues and places of worship to submit emergency plans to law enforcement agencies for purpose of preparing for mass casualty and active shooter events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1257 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1257 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5377 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3882 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3856 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1257 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5377 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3882 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3856 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee