NJ A1223 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1108
Note: Carry Over of previous A5476
Note: Carry Over of previous A5476
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires rail passenger service to provide purchasers with proof of payment at time of purchase.
Title
Requires rail passenger service to provide purchasers with proof of payment at time of purchase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1223 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5476 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3507 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A5476 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3507 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee