NJ A1220 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2477

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S675 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2019-05-16AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2019-01-31AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-2)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S675
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (59-13-0)
2018-01-29AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2477 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-13-0)
S675 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A1220

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback