NJ A12 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey College Affordability Act"; appropriates $10 million.
Title
"New Jersey College Affordability Act"; appropriates $10 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3997 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3997 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.128. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S3997 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3997 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A12 (1R)