NJ A1185 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A574
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Comptroller to report findings of audit compliance reviews.
Title
Requires State Comptroller to report findings of audit compliance reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2771 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.204. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2771 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A574 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2771 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1185
S2771 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by A1185