NJ A1171 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6012
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.164.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to create Statewide database of certified payroll information for public works projects.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Labor and Workforce Development to create Statewide database of certified payroll information for public works projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1260 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1260 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.164. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S1260 (1R) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6012 (Carry Over) 2019-11-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1260 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1171
S1260 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A1171