NJ A1158 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A517
Note: Carry Over of previous A5280
Note: Carry Over of previous A5280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1934
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes use of disability benefits for transportation provided by transportation network companies.
Title
Authorizes use of disability benefits for transportation provided by transportation network companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S1934 |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1158 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S1934
A5280 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1934 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A5280 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1934 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session