NJ A1116 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A471
Note: Carry Foward to future S1487
Note: Carry Over of previous A5560
Note: Carry Over of previous S3953

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for uniform regulation of small wireless facility deployment in this State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (63-9-2)
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-06-14AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-10AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1116 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A1116 (Carry Over) 2021-06-28 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5560 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2674 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Weinberg)
S3953 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback