NJ A111 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A132
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that farm, farmstand, or other agricultural operation selling firewood obtained from property other than seller's shall not be considered lumber yard; prohibits sale of untreated firewood from outside of State.
Title
Provides that farm, farmstand, or other agricultural operation selling firewood obtained from property other than seller's shall not be considered lumber yard; prohibits sale of untreated firewood from outside of State.
Sponsors
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Bethanne McCarthy Patrick [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Rep. Beth Sawyer [R] | Rep. Brandon Umba [R] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3201 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-04 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3201 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-04 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.227. |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3201 |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2022-10-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-1) |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A132 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S3201 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A111 (1R)
S3201 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by A111 (1R)