NJ A1100 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4006

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-27 - Approved P.L.2018, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1586 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-27AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.140.
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2018-10-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-10-29SenateEmergency Resolution (39-0) (Gopal)
2018-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (38-0) (Gopal)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S1586 (1R)
2018-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2018-03-26AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4006 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1586 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1100 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback