NJ A1076 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2469
Note: Carryover of previous A2469

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a public school district to provide a daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a public school district to provide a daily recess period for students in grades kindergarten through 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2469 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2469 (Carry Over) 2014-02-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S847 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback