NJ A105 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1125
Note: Carry Foward to future S1830
Note: Carry Over of previous A2142
Note: Carry Over of previous S526
Note: Carry Foward to future S1830
Note: Carry Over of previous A2142
Note: Carry Over of previous S526
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain federal income tax advantages of individual health savings accounts to individual taxpayers under the New Jersey gross income tax.
Title
Extends certain federal income tax advantages of individual health savings accounts to individual taxpayers under the New Jersey gross income tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Kevin Rooney [R] | Rep. Erik Peterson [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A105 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A105 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2142 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1415 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S526 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A105 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2142 (Carry Over) 2018-01-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1415 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S526 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A105 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/105_I1.HTM |