NJ A1039 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3053
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.154.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Division of Travel and Tourism to publish on its website information of farm-to-table restaurants.
Title
Directs the Division of Travel and Tourism to publish on its website information of farm-to-table restaurants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2499 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.154. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2499 |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3053 (Carry Over) 2016-06-16 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2499 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1039
S2499 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1039