NJ A1028 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4733

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes training program to prevent suicide by law enforcement officer;requires reporting of law enforcement officer suicides to Attorney General.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes training program to prevent suicide by law enforcement officer;requires reporting of law enforcement officer suicides to Attorney General.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1730 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2020-01-13SenateSubstituted for S1730 (1R)
2020-01-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-06SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4733 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1730 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1028 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback