NJ A1023 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3759
Note: Carry Foward to future A2624
Note: Carry Over of previous A5064
Note: Carry Over of previous S3489
Note: Carry Foward to future A2624
Note: Carry Over of previous A5064
Note: Carry Over of previous S3489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits authority of DHS to impose liens and seek recovery from Medicaid recipient's estate after death.
Title
Limits authority of DHS to impose liens and seek recovery from Medicaid recipient's estate after death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A5064 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S885 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3489 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1023 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A5064 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S885 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3489 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1023 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1023_I1.HTM |