NJ A1013 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1418

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for jurisdiction for prosecution for certain crimes against minors committed outside New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for jurisdiction for prosecution for certain crimes against minors committed outside New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1418 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S783 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback