NH HB1649 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a road usage fee and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 173 NV: 28 Abs: 51) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - House - Table (Y: 120 N: 206 NV: 20 Abs: 50) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
2020-02-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0168h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-173 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
2020-02-13HouseAmendment # 2020-0168h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
2020-02-13HouseLay on Table (Rep. Bordy): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 120-206 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 19
2020-01-30HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0168h for 02/13/2020 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7
2020-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 01/28/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2020-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 201
2019-12-12HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 30

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback