NH SJR1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the implementation of certain rules of the board of education.
Title
Prohibiting the implementation of certain rules of the board of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-06-03 | House | Public Hearing: 06/09/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99271793737 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Education |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved Ought to Pass; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Introduction; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |