NH SCR3 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-27 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Applying to the United States Congress to convene a limited convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing amendments to the federal Constitution concerning election reform that do not abrogate or amend the first amendment to the federal Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applying to the United States Congress to convene a limited convention for the exclusive purpose of proposing amendments to the federal Constitution concerning election reform that do not abrogate or amend the first amendment to the federal Constitution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-19 - House - OTP (Y: 171 N: 119 NV: 54 Abs: 54) [FAIL]
2016-05-19 - House - Remove from Table (Y: 171 N: 106 NV: 67 Abs: 54) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-27HouseDied on Table
2016-05-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ulery): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 13
2016-05-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 171-119 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 12
2016-05-19HouseRemove from Table (Rep. Ulery): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-106 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 10
2016-05-11HouseLay on Table (Rep. Ulery): Motion Adopted DV 148-129 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 118
2016-04-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 29 P. 29
2016-04-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 10-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 29 P. 29
2016-04-12HouseExecutive Session: 04/21/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2016-03-30HousePublic Hearing: 04/07/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2016-03-29HouseIntroduced 03/23/2016 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 27 P. 68
2016-03-24SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1056s, New Title, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; Senate Journal 10
2016-03-24SenateCommittee Amendment 1056s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/24/2016 Senate Journal 10
2016-03-24SenateSpecial Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 10
2016-03-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1056s, New Title, 03/24/2016; Senate Calendar 11
2016-01-07SenateHearing: 01/14/2016, Room 103, State House, 01:25 pm; Senate Calendar 1
2016-01-06SenateIntroduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs by the necessary 2/3 vote, Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-26; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2814&sy=2016&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=SCR3
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?id=1006&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2016&id=1006&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=53&sy=2016&lb=S&eb=SCR0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=SCR3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2814
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=200&sy=2016&lb=H&eb=SCR0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=SCR3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2814
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=201&sy=2016&lb=H&eb=SCR0003&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2016&txtbillnumber=SCR3&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2814

Bill Comments

feedback