NH SCR1 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 356-6 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 356-6 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Affirming the general courts support for New Hampshires first in the nation primary.
Title
Affirming the general courts support for New Hampshires first in the nation primary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 6 NV: 19 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 356 N: 6 NV: 20 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 356-6 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 30 |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/18/2023 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Election Law |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to suspend all rules necessary to permit the consideration of Senate Calendar R1 at the present time; 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Introduction; 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |