NH SCR1 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2116e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the contribution of Bhutanese refugees to New Hampshire, and requesting the United States government to work diligently on resolving the Bhutanese refugee crisis, reaching an agreement to allow the option of repatriation, and promoting human rights and democracy in Bhutan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the contribution of Bhutanese refugees to New Hampshire, and requesting the United States government to work diligently on resolving the Bhutanese refugee crisis, reaching an agreement to allow the option of repatriation, and promoting human rights and democracy in Bhutan.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2116e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-10HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2116EBA: Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1955
2015-06-03HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1832
2015-05-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1631
2015-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 4/30/2015 Legislative Office Building 303
2015-04-23HouseContinued Public Hearing: 4/30/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-04-07HousePublic Hearing: 4/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303==RECESSED==
2015-03-31HouseIntroduced and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299
2015-03-26SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-26SenateSpecial Order Senate Calendar R 1 to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 10
2015-03-26SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Remove Senate Calendar R 1 from the Consent Calendar
2015-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2015-03-11SenateHearing: 3/18/15, Room 100, State House, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs by the necessary 2/3 vote, Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-26; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback