NH SB99 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0210; Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-09 - Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0210; Effective 10/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the responsibilities of insurers in conducting reviews of the operations of administrators.
Title
Relative to the responsibilities of insurers in conducting reviews of the operations of administrators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0210; Effective 10/03/2023 |
2023-07-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/29/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1456h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 4 |
2023-06-08 | House | Amendment # 2023-1456h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 |
2023-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1456h 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7A |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |