NH SB96 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Introduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to implicit bias training for judges; establishing a body-worn and in-carcamera fund and making an appropriation therefor; amending juvenile delinquencyproceedings and transfers to superior court; and establishing committees to study therole and scope of authority of school resource officers and the collection of race andethnicity data on state identification cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to implicit bias training for judges; establishing a body-worn and in-carcamera fund and making an appropriation therefor; amending juvenile delinquencyproceedings and transfers to superior court; and establishing committees to study therole and scope of authority of school resource officers and the collection of race andethnicity data on state identification cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1058s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0996s (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Divide Remainder (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Divide Sec. 4 & 11 (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Judiciary
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0996s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateSen. Whitley Floor Amendment # 2021-1058s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0996s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0996s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0773s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment #2021-0773s, Remainder of the Committee Amendment and the Effective Date, and the Clerk is instructed to make the administrative corrections, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment #2021-0773s, Sections 4 and 11, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment #2021-0773s, Sections 4 and 11, and then the Remainder of the Committee Amendment and the Effective Date; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0773s, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-01-27SenateRemote Hearing: 02/02/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1001&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=992&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=992
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=992
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=192&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=193&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=194&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=243&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=244&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=245&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0096&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB96&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1001

Bill Comments

feedback