NH SB89 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Part IV Effective 07/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to election procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation relative to election procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Adopt Amendment 2021-1610h (Y: 202 N: 175 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 202 N: 175 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0825s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-03SenatePart IV Effective 07/30/2021
2021-08-03SenatePart III Effective 07/30/2021
2021-08-03SenatePart II Effective 09/28/2021
2021-08-03SenatePart I Effective 09/28/2021
2021-08-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/30/2021; Chapter 0177
2021-07-15HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-15SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10SenateSen. Gray Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1610h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 202-175 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 137
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1610h: Motion Adopted DV 200-174 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 138
2021-05-26HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-05-26HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1610h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 21
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-1445h: 05/19/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99392215410
2021-05-12HouseExecutive Session: 05/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99392215410
2021-04-29HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/05/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/98783397971 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-15HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/96682102830 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-15House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/22/2021 11:15 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99446784139 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 51
2021-03-25SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0825s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-25SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0825s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0825s, 03/25/2021; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-03SenateRemote Hearing: 03/08/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=999&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=990&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=990
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=990
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=208&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=209&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=164&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=436&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=164&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=208&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=209&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0999
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=436&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0089&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB89&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0999

Bill Comments 750

feedback