NH SB89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0255; Effective 07/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0255; Effective 07/18/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the relationship between a franchisor and a franchisee.
Title
Relative to the relationship between a franchisor and a franchisee.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Sen. William Gannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/18/2017; Chapter 0255; Effective 07/18/2017 |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-07-05 | House | Enrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27 |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2387e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2387e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2017-2295c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/22/2017; Senate Journal 20 |
2017-06-22 | House | Conference Committee Report 2295c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 7 |
2017-06-14 | House | Conference Committee Report #2017-2295c Filed 06/14/2017; As Amended by the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/13/2017, 10:00 am, Room 100, State House |
2017-06-08 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Biggie, Butler, Flanders 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 6 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Innis, Carson, Lasky; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2136h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 147 |
2017-06-01 | House | FLAM #2017-2136h (NT) (Rep. Kurk): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 144 |
2017-06-01 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kurk) 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 5 |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/01/2017 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 6 |
2017-05-10 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-05-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/10/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-05-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-04-18 | House | Public Hearing: 05/02/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |