NH SB87 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the syringe service programs.
Title
Relative to the syringe service programs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2019; Chapter 0154; Effective 07/01/2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 14 |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/23/2019 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 5 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-17 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |