NH SB87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0265; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0265; Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the patients' bill of rights.
Title
Relative to the patients' bill of rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Lucy Weber [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0265; Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2186e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2186e Adopted; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Concur with House Amendment #1701h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1701h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1466-1468 |
2013-05-22 | House | Amendment #1701h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1466-1468 |
2013-05-14 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1701h; House Calendar39, PG.1280-1282 |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1701h for May 22 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar39, PG.1261 |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 ==Or One Hour Following House Session== |
2013-04-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0850s, 0930s Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Gilmour Floor Amendment #2013-0930s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0850s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0850s, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |