NH SB87 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the closure of certain underground storage tank systems.
Title
Relative to the closure of certain underground storage tank systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 8, Pg.88 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/3/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |