NH SB84 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB84
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to legislative study committees and commissions.
Title
Relative to legislative study committees and commissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Rep. Bill Bolton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-0827s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0827s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0827s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB84 (Carry Over) 2023-05-17 - Retained in Committee