NH SB82 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB82
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Commerce and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prompt payments for managed care.
Title
Relative to prompt payments for managed care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-30 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/06/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-05-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-04-07 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB82 (Carry Over) 2023-09-06 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36