NH SB81 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the department of health and human services to hire certain personnel and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the department of health and human services to hire certain personnel and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Finance
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback