NH SB80 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB80
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the recording of custodial interrogations and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Requiring the recording of custodial interrogations and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB80 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10