NH SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing an independent advisory commission on redistricting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an independent advisory commission on redistricting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4
2021-02-01SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-21SenateRemote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 09:45 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback