NH SB80 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0078; Effective 04/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0078; Effective 04/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expanding the community revitalization tax relief program to provide incentives for rehabilitating historic structures.
Title
Relative to expanding the community revitalization tax relief program to provide incentives for rehabilitating historic structures.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. David Hess [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0078; Effective 04/01/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1243 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1095 |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/10/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0855s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0855s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0855s, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/13, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |