NH SB80 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain rental income from the meals and rooms tax.
Title
Exempting certain rental income from the meals and rooms tax.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. Mary Griffin [R] |
Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.60 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/11, Room 100 State House, 1:35 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |