NH SB77 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0059; Effective 07/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0059; Effective 07/31/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to changes in school placement for students.
Title
Relative to changes in school placement for students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 187 N: 183 NV: 11 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 187 N: 183 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - OTP (Y: 187 N: 183 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0059; Effective 07/31/2023 |
2023-05-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/18/2023); Senate Journal 16 |
2023-05-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 187-183 05/04/2023 House Journal 13 P. 20 |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 04/11/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) |
2023-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; Senate Journal 5 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Senate Calendar 7A |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |