NH SB77 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fees for the services of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs.
Title
Relative to fees for the services of sheriffs and deputy sheriffs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2021 |
2021-07-06 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 8/30/2021 |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/01/2021; Chapter 0104 |
2021-06-25 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1363h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1363h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1363h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Finance House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/18/2021; Senate Journal 5 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/18/2021; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3 |