NH SB77 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expense deductions under the business profits tax.
Title
Relative to expense deductions under the business profits tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Pending Motion Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/09/2017; Senate Journal 8 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/09/2017; Senate Calendar 12 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing: 02/22/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |