NH SB760 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal background checks for school bus drivers.
Title
Relative to criminal background checks for school bus drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1189s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Cavanaugh Floor Amendment # 2020-1189s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |