NH SB76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to modified risk tobacco products.
Title
Relative to modified risk tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/04/2021; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/27/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 3 |