NH SB757 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the local option for operation of sports book retail locations.
Title
Relative to the local option for operation of sports book retail locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] | Rep. Michael O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Paul Bergeron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/18/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |