NH SB756 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for emergency volunteers.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for emergency volunteers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5 |