NH SB755 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to superior court judgments in actions against the state.
Title
Relative to superior court judgments in actions against the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |