NH SB754 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1070s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1070s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-11SenateSpecial Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1070s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-20Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback